CA AB366 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 4920) to Chapter 11 of Division 2 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend, Section 9210 of, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to animal health.
Title
Animals: blood, blood components, and biologics.
Sponsors
Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D] | Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4920 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 9210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB366 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB366 |