CA AB371 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13978.8 of, and to add Section 12096.3.5 to, the Government Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Transportation: freight: statewide economic growth, prosperity, and resiliency assessment.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Frazier [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 2). |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and TRANS. |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12096.3.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 13978.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |