CA AB392 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 170, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 196 and 835a of the Penal Code, relating to peace officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Peace officers: deadly force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB392 Weber et al. By Mitchell (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 392 Weber Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-19 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 170, Statutes of 2019.
2019-08-19 Approved by the Governor.
2019-08-12AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2019-07-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-07-08SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 1990.).
2019-06-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 18).
2019-06-12SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 2068.)
2019-05-28AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-05-28AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-05-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-05-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-03-27AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2019-02-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-02-07AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
2019-02-06AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code196Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code835Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback