CA AB4 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 29, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 29, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2155.4 to the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Voter notification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB4 Waldron (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - AB 4 WALDRON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - AB 4 WALDRON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 29, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-06-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-06-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1487.). |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 6). |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1015.) |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2016-12-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 2155.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 2199 | New Code | See Bill Text |