CA AB4 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14007.8 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 4 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 17 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 17. Page 2031.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 16). |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14007.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |