CA AB41 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8686 of the Government Code, relating to disaster relief, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Disaster relief: Camp Fire.
Sponsors
Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Asm. Megan Dahle [R] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] |
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] | Asm. Tom Daly [D] | Asm. Adam Gray [D] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] |
Sen. Melissa Melendez [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 41 Gallagher Third Reading Urgency (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 41 Gallagher Third Reading Urgency (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1855.). |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8686 | Amended Code | Citation Text |