CA AB412 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17210 of the Financial Code, relating to escrow agents.
Title
Escrow agents: asset requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-30 - Assembly - AB 412 Quirk-Silva Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB412 Quirk-Silva et al. By Caballero (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 412 Quirk-Silva Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB412 Quirk-Silva et al. By Caballero (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 412 Quirk-Silva Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-11 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2019-09-09 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2019-09-09 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2892.). |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2288.). |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1360.) |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2019-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 17210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |