CA AB414 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 801, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 61050 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to health care coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care coverage: minimum essential coverage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 414 Bonta Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB414 Bonta By Pan (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 414 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 801, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-12 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-24AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-12AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 3471.).
2019-09-11AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (September 11).
2019-09-10AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3303.)
2019-09-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2019-09-10AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.)
2019-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 2693.).
2019-08-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-12SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-07-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 10).
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-07-05SenateRe-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HEALTH.
2019-07-05SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2019-07-03SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-26SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-06-12SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and GOV. & F.
2019-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 18. Page 2107.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-17AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-17AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16).
2019-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-02-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-02-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
2019-02-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code100700New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code61000New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code61050New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback