CA AB418 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Durazo.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Durazo.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 912 and 917 of, and to add Article 9.5 (commencing with Section 1048) to Chapter 4 of Division 8 of, the Evidence Code, relating to privilege.
Title
Evidentiary privileges: union agent-represented worker privilege.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AB 418 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Noes: (Y: 0 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AB 418 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Noes: (Y: 0 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Durazo. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Durazo. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 2). |
2019-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 1248.) |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (March 12). |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Evidence Code | 1048 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Evidence Code | 912 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Evidence Code | 917 | Amended Code | Citation Text |