CA AB427 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 17132.9 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal income taxes: exclusion: uniformed services: retirement pay.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2019-05-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
2019-05-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-13AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
2019-05-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2019-04-08AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-18AssemblyIn committee: Hearing for testimony only.
2019-03-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2019-03-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-11AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-02-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2019-02-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
2019-02-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17132.9New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback