CA AB434 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 192, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 192, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 53563 and 53559.1 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 50517.5, 50675.1, 50675.7, 53545.13, 53560, 53562, 53566, 53591 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 987.005 and 987.010 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to housing, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Housing financing programs: uniform procedures.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 434 DALY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB434 Daly By Skinner (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 434 Daly Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Asm Housing and Community Development (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB434 Daly By Skinner (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 434 Daly Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Asm Housing and Community Development (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 192, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5502.). |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 5498.) |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 31). |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5456.) |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.). |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-08-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2107.) |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and V.A. |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 50517.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50675.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50675.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 53545.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 53559.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 53560 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 53562 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 53563 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 53566 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 53591 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 987.005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 987.010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |