CA AB439 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 161, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 161, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 709 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Juveniles: competency.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-11 - Senate - Special Consent AB439 Mark Stone Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 439 Mark Stone Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 439 Mark Stone Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-31 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 161, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-31 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2056.). |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HUMAN S. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1359.). |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HUM. S. |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 709 | Amended Code | Citation Text |