CA AB450 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 300, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 300, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 29041, 29047, 29048, 29070, 29070.5, 29101, 29302, and 29313 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to bees.
Title
Bees: Apiary Protection Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-30 - Assembly - AB 450 Arambula Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB450 Arambula et al. By Hurtado (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - Bill Votes (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 450 Irwin Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - 03/27/19 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB450 Arambula et al. By Hurtado (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - Bill Votes (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 450 Irwin Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - 03/27/19 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 300, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2893.). |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2270.). |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1360.) |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 29041 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 29047 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 29048 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 29070 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 29070.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 29101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 29302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 29313 | Amended Code | Citation Text |