CA AB46 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 9, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 9, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4005 of the Harbors and Navigation Code, to amend Sections 1026, 1367, 2625, 2960, 2962, 2966, 2968, 2970, 2972, 2974, 2978, 4011.6, 4497, 4497.10, and 6102 of the Penal Code, to amend Section 6100.5 of the Probate Code, to amend Section 253 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend Sections 4242, 5213, and 5300 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Individuals with mental illness: change of term.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB46 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 46 Carrillo Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 46 Carrillo Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 9, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-06-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1606.). |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1472.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Harbors and Navigation Code | 4005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1026 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1367 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2625 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2960 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2962 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2966 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2968 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2970 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2972 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2974 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2978 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4011.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4497 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4497.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 6100.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 253 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4242 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |