CA AB465 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 137, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 137, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5848.7 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Mental health workers: supervision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 465 EGGMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB465 Eggman et al. By Rubio (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 465 Eggman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB465 Eggman et al. By Rubio (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 465 Eggman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 137, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5485.). |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to the unfinished business file. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2020-08-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4297.). |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-17 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 31). |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Rubio. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (September 11). |
2019-09-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Joint Rules 61 and 62 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2745.) |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-28 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1359.) |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S. |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5848.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |