CA AB5 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 296, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 296, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3351 of, and to add Section 2750.3 to, the Labor Code, and to amend Sections 606.5 and 621 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to employment, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Worker status: employees and independent contractors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 5 Gonzalez Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 5 Gonzalez Concurrence in Senate Amendments Motion to Appeal the Decision of the Chair By GALLAGHER (Y: 16 N: 53 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB5 Gonzalez et al. By Durazo (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 5 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 5 Gonzalez Concurrence in Senate Amendments Motion to Appeal the Decision of the Chair By GALLAGHER (Y: 16 N: 53 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB5 Gonzalez et al. By Durazo (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 5 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 296, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 3375.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2770.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 10). |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 15. Page 2071.) |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1984.) |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Page 1969.) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time and amended. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 16). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.) |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 606.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 621 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 2750.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 3351 | Amended Code | Citation Text |