CA AB508 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 352, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 116681 and 116682 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drinking water: consolidation and extension of service: domestic wells.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-05 - Assembly - AB 508 Chu Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB508 Chu By Hertzberg (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 508 Chu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 352, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-27 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-05AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 15. Page 3016.).
2019-09-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 2446.).
2019-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-19SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-08-12SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-31SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-05SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-07-03SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 3).
2019-06-12SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Coms. on EQ. and GOV. & F.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 1868.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 16).
2019-05-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
2019-05-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-13AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
2019-05-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-29AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2019-04-11AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 9).
2019-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2019-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-25AssemblyReferred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and L. GOV.
2019-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2019-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback