CA AB51 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 711, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 711, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12953 to the Government Code, and to add Section 432.6 to the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment discrimination: enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-05 - Senate - 08/30/19 (Y: 5 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB51 Gonzalez By Jackson (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 51 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 20 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB51 Gonzalez By Jackson (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 51 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 20 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 711, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2572.). |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 20. Page 1784.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16). |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (March 19). |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12953 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 432.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |