CA AB527 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 653o of the Penal Code, relating to endangered wildlife.
Title
Importation, possession, or sale of endangered wildlife.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 9). |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 653 | Amended Code | Citation Text |