CA AB528 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 677, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 677, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 209 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 11164.1, 11165, 11165.1, and 11165.4 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
Controlled substances: CURES database.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-13 - Assembly - AB 528 Low Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB528 Low By Pan (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 528 Low Third Reading Urgency (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB528 Low By Pan (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 528 Low Third Reading Urgency (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 677, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3554.). |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (September 13). |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3461.) |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3439.) |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 2760.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 1). |
2019-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1471.). |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 209 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11164.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11165 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11165.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11165.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |