CA AB570 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-28 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dodd.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-28 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dodd.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 33314.5 to the Education Code, to amend Section 53167 of, and to add Sections 12096.3.5 and 26231 to, the Government Code, and to amend and repeal Section 281 of, to add Section 884.2 to, and to add and repeal Sections 281.1, 281.2, 281.3, and 281.4 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to communications, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Communications: broadband services: California Advanced Services Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 570 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 20 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 570 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 20 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-28 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dodd. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20). |
2020-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (August 3). |
2020-07-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wiener. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 10). |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 20. Page 2121.) |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 1). |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 33314.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 12096.3.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 26231 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 53167 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 281 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 884.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |