CA AB576 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 15570.22, 15570.24, 15570.26, 15672, and 15674 of, to repeal Section 15600 of, and to add Section 15679.6 to, the Government Code, relating to taxation.
Title
State Board of Equalization: transfer of duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 15570.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15570.24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15570.26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15600 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15672 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15674 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15679.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |