CA AB582 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 8 (commencing with Section 58597) to Part 1 of Division 21 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to agricultural products.
Title
Retailers: sale of agricultural products: grown in California requirement: exception.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 582 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 3. Page 3892.) |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 23). |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 58597 | New Code | See Bill Text |