CA AB590 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 16428.81 to the Government Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
Greenhouse Gas Reduction Fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Dahle [R] | Asm. Rudy Salas [D] | Asm. William Brough [R] | Asm. Rocky Chavez [R] |
Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D] | Asm. Richard Gordon [D] | Asm. Kristin Olsen [R] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 590 DAHLE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Utilities and Commerce (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 590 DAHLE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Utilities and Commerce (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30). |
2015-06-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and E.Q. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1806.) |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & C. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16428.81 | New Code | See Bill Text |