CA AB596 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 490, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 490, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1795.91 of the Civil Code, and to add Section 11755 to the Vehicle Code, relating to motor vehicles.
Title
Motor vehicle defects: service bulletins and consumer electronic authorization.
Sponsors
Asm. Tim Grayson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 596 Grayson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB596 Grayson By Jones (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 596 Grayson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB596 Grayson By Jones (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 596 Grayson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 490, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3274.). |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.) |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2678.). |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1589.) |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 2). |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and P. & C.P. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1795.91 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 11755 | New Code | See Bill Text |