CA AB6 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-29 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-29 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17206 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 5650.1 of the Fish and Game Code, to amend Sections 12502 and 12530 of the Government Code, and to add and repeal Division 10.10 (commencing with Section 11999.30) of the Health and Safety Code, relating to the Attorney General, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Attorney General: duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 6 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 6 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-29 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hurtado. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2015.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 27). |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUM. S. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 17206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 5650.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12530 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11999.30 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |