CA AB608 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-09 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-09 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2069 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Medical assistants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-16 - Assembly - AB 608 IRWIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-08-09 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-08-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-06-06 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 3779.) |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 8). |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and PUB. S. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2069 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1785.11.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1546.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |