CA AB618 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 2.62 (commencing with Section 7286.22) and Chapter 2.63 (commencing with Section 7286.23) to Part 1.7 of Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Transactions and use taxes: City of Scotts Valley: City of Emeryville.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-01 - Assembly - AB 618 Mark Stone Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB618 Mark Stone et al. By Monning (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 618 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 22 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB618 Mark Stone et al. By Monning (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 618 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 22 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-11 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2019-08-12 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2019-07-12 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 21. Page 2483.). |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 8. Page 1819.). |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2019-06-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 22. Page 1519.) |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 29). |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7286.22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7286.23 | New Code | See Bill Text |