CA AB639 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 116, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 12893.1 of the Government Code, relating to workforce development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Workforce Development Board: port automation and climate change.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 639 CERVANTES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB639 Cervantes By Gonzalez (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 639 Cervantes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-24 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 116, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-24 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-14AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2020-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.).
2020-08-31AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2020-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-31SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.).
2020-08-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-28SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-08-28SenateOrdered to second reading.
2020-08-28SenateFrom inactive file.
2019-09-05SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg.
2019-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-07-08SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2019-06-05SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Coms. on EQ. and G.O.
2019-05-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1811.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-04-04AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-03AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 2).
2019-02-28AssemblyReferred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and NAT. RES.
2019-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2019-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12893.1Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback