CA AB646 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-30 - Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 16. Page 5347.).
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 2101, 2105.6, 2105.7, 2106, 2150, 2201, 2212, 2300, and 14240 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections: voter eligibility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 646 McCarty Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB646 McCarty et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Assembly - AB 646 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 20 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-30 Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 16. Page 5347.).
2020-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 320, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-08AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2020-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2020-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-28SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 10.).
2020-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20).
2020-08-13SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-08-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-08SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2020-01-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-01-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 20. Page 3938.)
2020-01-27AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 3893.)
2020-01-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-23AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-01-23AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (January 23).
2019-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-03-13AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2019-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2019-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback