CA AB651 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 537, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 537, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 76000.10 of the Government Code, to add Section 1371.55 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10126.65 to the Insurance Code, relating to air ambulance services.
Title
Air ambulance services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB651 Grayson et al. By Dodd (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - AB 651 Grayson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 651 Grayson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - AB 651 Grayson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 651 Grayson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 537, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3561.). |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2927.). |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2690.) |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1812.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 76000.10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1371.55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10126.65 | New Code | See Bill Text |