CA AB664 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-01 - Ordered to inactive file by unanimous consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-01 - Ordered to inactive file by unanimous consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6401 and 6403 of, and to add and repeal Section 3212.18 of, the Labor Code, relating to workers’ compensation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Workers’ compensation: injury: COVID-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 664 Cooper Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 664 Cooper Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file by unanimous consent. |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (August 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-31 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-05-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-04-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and APPR. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1617.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 3212.18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 6401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 6403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |