CA AB670 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 178, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 178, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 4751 to the Civil Code, relating to common interest developments.
Title
Common interest developments: accessory dwelling units.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-15 - Assembly - AB 670 Friedman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB670 Friedman et al. By Wieckowski (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 670 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB670 Friedman et al. By Wieckowski (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 670 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 178, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-08-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2719.). |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2134.). |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2019-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and JUD. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1519.) |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 4751 | New Code | See Bill Text |