CA AB68 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 655, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 655, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65852.2 and 65852.22 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Land use: accessory dwelling units.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Asm. Laura Friedman [D] | Asm. Todd Gloria [D] | Asm. Tim Grayson [D] |
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB68 Ting et al. By Nielsen (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - AB 68 Ting Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 68 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - AB 68 Ting Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 68 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 655, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 5. Page 3561.). |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 2925.). |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2690.) |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING, EQ. and GOV. & F. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 10. Page 1784.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 16). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65852.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65852.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |