CA AB681 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2152, 3203, 3205, 4100, 13102, 13502, and 18402 of, to add Sections 2119.5, 12100, and 13503 to, to add Chapter 0.5 (commencing with Section 3000) to Division 3 of, and to repeal Section 3000 of, the Elections Code, relating to elections, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Elections: voter registration: partisan primary elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-13 - Assembly - AB 681 Gonzalez Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 65 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB681 Gonzalez By Umberg Urgency Clause (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Result (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 681 Gonzalez Third Reading Urgency (Y: 60 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB681 Gonzalez By Umberg Urgency Clause (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Result (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 681 Gonzalez Third Reading Urgency (Y: 60 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2019-10-13 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2019-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 13. Page 3568.). |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 13). |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3461.) |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3439.) |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2781.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 16. Page 2122.). |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 16). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 12100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 13102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 13502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 13503 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 18402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2119.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 2152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 3000 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 3203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 3205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 4100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |