CA AB699 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1789.11, 1789.12, 1789.13, 1789.14, 1789.15, 1789.16, 1789.19, 1789.21, and 1789.25 of, and to add Sections 1789.134 and 1789.135 to, the Civil Code, relating to consumer credit.
Title
Credit services organizations.
Sponsors
Asm. Tim Grayson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 699 Grayson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 3892.) |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 23). |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P.) |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3769.) |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and P. & C.P. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1789.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1789.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1789.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1789.134 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1789.135 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1789.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1789.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1789.16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1789.19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1789.21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1789.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |