CA AB70 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 153, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 153, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 94801.5 of, and to add Sections 94850.2, 94858.5, and 94874.1 to, the Education Code, relating to private postsecondary education.
Title
Private postsecondary education: California Private Postsecondary Education Act of 2009.
Sponsors
Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D] | Asm. Marc Berman [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Sen. Susan Eggman [D] |
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Asm. Jose Medina [D] | Asm. Steven Choi [R] | Asm. Todd Gloria [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 70 Berman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB70 Berman et al. By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-08 - Senate - Amendments (Committee's) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-08 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [08-10-2020]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 70 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB70 Berman et al. By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-08 - Senate - Amendments (Committee's) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-08 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [08-10-2020]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 70 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 153, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5350.). |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4404.). |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2020-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-08-06 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 4092.) |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3889.) |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23). |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 94801.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94850.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 94858.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 94874.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |