CA AB713 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 172, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1798.130 of, and to add Sections 1798.146 and 1798.148 to, the Civil Code, relating to consumer privacy, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Consumer Privacy Act of 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-01 - Assembly - AB 713 MULLIN Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB713 Mullin et al. By Pan Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 713 Mullin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-25 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 172, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-25 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-14AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2020-09-01AssemblyUrgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0.).
2020-08-31AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2020-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-31SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.).
2020-08-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-28SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-27SenateOrdered to third reading.
2020-08-26SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2020-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-08-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20).
2020-08-13SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-07-30SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-30SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2020-07-29SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-06-11SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-01-23SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-01-09SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-01-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 8). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-01-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-06-13SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-05-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2049.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-04-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
2019-04-01AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-03-28AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-03-27AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 26).
2019-02-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2019-02-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1798.130Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.146New CodeSee Bill Text
Civil Code1798.148New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback