CA AB714 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 231, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 231, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 740 and 741 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Opioid prescription drugs: prescribers.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-22 - Assembly - AB 714 Wood Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB714 Wood By Glazer Urv class="statusCell"> (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB714 Wood By Glazer Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 714 Wood Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB714 Wood By Glazer Urv class="statusCell"> (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB714 Wood By Glazer Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 714 Wood Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 231, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2794.). |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2201.). |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2019-06-04 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1476.). |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 740 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 741 | Amended Code | Citation Text |