CA AB716 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 15, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 15, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17913 and 17916 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to business.
Title
Fictitious business name statements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB716 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 716 Chen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 716 Chen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 15, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-06-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1607.). |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1637.) |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (March 26). |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and P. & C.P. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 17913 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 17916 | Amended Code | Citation Text |