CA AB729 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 680, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 680, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 42971, 42972, 42974, 42977, 42978, and 42981 of, to add Section 42972.7 to, and to repeal Section 42972.5 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to recycling.
Title
Carpet recycling: carpet stewardship.
Sponsors
Asm. Kansen Chu [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 729 Chu Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB729 Chu By Jackson (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 729 Chu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB729 Chu By Jackson (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 729 Chu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 680, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 3126.). |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2515.). |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 3). |
2019-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and JUD. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 1779.) |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 15). |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42971 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42972 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42972.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42972.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42974 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42977 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42978 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42981 | Amended Code | Citation Text |