CA AB740 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-02 - Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-02 - Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8372 of, and to add Section 8371.1 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity: microgrids.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 740 Burke Third Reading Urgency (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 740 Burke Third Reading Urgency (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on INS., E., U. & C. and GOV. & F. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2125.). |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 2125.) |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 2049.) |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 8371.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8372 | Amended Code | Citation Text |