CA AB754 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 494, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 494, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11545 and 65850.5 of the Government Code, relating to regional notification centers.
Title
Regional notification centers: GIS data: excavations.
Sponsors
Asm. Tim Grayson [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-14 - Assembly - AB 754 Grayson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB754 Grayson et al. By Hill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 754 Grayson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB754 Grayson et al. By Hill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 754 Grayson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 494, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3582.). |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2930.). |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2745.) |
2019-09-10 | Senate | From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 10) |
2019-09-09 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 1). |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1476.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 2). |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11545 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65850.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |