CA AB767 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-20 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-20 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 13951 and 13956 of the Government Code, relating to victim compensation, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Victim compensation: use of excessive force by a peace officer.
Sponsors
Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Tim Grayson [D] | Sen. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D] |
Asm. Shirley Weber [D] | Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 767 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 10 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 767 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 10 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-20 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2020-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-07-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 10. Page 2036.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.) |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 23). |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13951 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 13956 | Amended Code | Citation Text |