CA AB77 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-27 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-27 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 313.3, 2572, 8209, 8227.7, 8280, 8280.1, 14002, 14041, 14041.5, 14041.6, 17375, 17524, 35710.5, 38000, 41203.1, 41327.1, 41341, 41370, 42127, 42127.6, 42127.8, 42131, 42238.02, 42238.025, 42238.03, 42238.15, 44955.5, 46200.5, 46201.5, 47604.1, 47605, 47607, 47607.2, 47607.5, 47612.5, 47612.7, 47632, 47635, 47644, 48000, 51461, 52064, 52074, 52202, 54444.2, 54444.3, 56122, 56195.1, 56345, 56477, 56836.06, 56836.07, 56836.08, 56836.10, 56836.11, 56836.159, 56836.165, 56836.21, 56836.22, 56836.24, and 56836.31 of, to amend and renumber Sections 56836.145 and 56836.15 of, to amend and repeal Section 56213 of, to add Sections 8227.8, 14041.8, 41020.9, 41204.2, 42238.021, 44225.4, 44235.4, 44266.5, 45227, 47653, 47654, 47655, and 56214 to, to add Article 2.2 (commencing with Section 56836.14) to Chapter 7.2 of Part 30 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, to add and repeal Sections 17463.7 and 42603.1 of, to add and repeal Part 24.5 (commencing with Section 43500) to Division 3 of Title 2 of, and to repeal Section 56836.045 of, the Education Code, to amend Section 17581.6 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 97.2 and 97.3 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, to add Chapter 5.4 (commencing with Section 13265) to Part 3 of Division 9 of, and to add Part 1.7 (commencing with Section 10200) to Division 9 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, to amend the Budget Act of 2019 (Chapters 23 and 55 of the Statutes of 2019) by amending Items 6100-158-0001, 6100-194-0001, and 6100-196-0001 of Section 2.00 of that act, and to amend Sections 1, 4, and 9 of Chapter 3 of the Statutes of 2020, relating to education finance, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Education finance: education omnibus budget trailer bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 77 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 77 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-27 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 24). |
2020-06-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (June 12). |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1166.) |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.) |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |