CA AB775 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 290, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 290, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4615 of, and to add Section 4615.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Massage therapy.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-26 - Assembly - AB 775 Chau Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Senate - Special Consent AB775 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Assembly - AB 775 Chau Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Senate - Special Consent AB775 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Assembly - AB 775 Chau Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 290, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2836.). |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2244.). |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 1). |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 917.) |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (March 26). |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4615 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4615.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |