CA AB778 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4945 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Acupuncture: continuing education.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 778 Low Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 778 Low Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Pan. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1361.) |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4945 | Amended Code | Citation Text |