CA AB79 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 11, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 17504 of the Family Code, to amend Section 6253.2 of, and to add Section 14669.22 to, the Government Code, to amend Sections 1267.75, 1506, 1506.3, 1517, 1531.15, and 1569.682 of, to add Section 1562.2 to, and to repeal Section 1567.70 of, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 246 of the Labor Code, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 1001.20, 1001.21, 1001.22, 1001.23, and 1001.29 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 4418.7, 4646.5, 4684.81, 4684.82, 4685.8, 4691.12, 7502.5, 11265, 11265.1, 11320.3, 11323.2, 11333, 11402.2, 11403.2, 11403.3, 11454.5, 11461.36, 11463, 11523, 11523.1, 12305.7, 12305.71, 15204.2, 16519.5, 16521.8, 16527, 16529, 16530, 18900.8, 18901, 18901.1, 18901.10, 18901.25, and 18927 of, to amend and repeal Sections 11322.85, 11322.86, 11322.87, and 12301.24 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 10831, 11265.2, 11265.45, 11320.15, 11322.8, 11325.21, 11325.24, 11454, and 17021 of, to add Sections 10004, 11265.15, 11454.1 18910.2, and 18918.1 to, to add and repeal Sections 11523.05 and 18906.55 of, and to repeal Sections 4684.87, 10832, and 11454.2 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to human services, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human services omnibus.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - Assembly - AB 79 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB79 BUDGET (Ting) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 79 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 11, Statutes of 2020.
2020-06-29 Approved by the Governor.
2020-06-26AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 6:30 p.m.
2020-06-26AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.).
2020-06-26AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 16.)
2020-06-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2020-06-25SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 11.).
2020-06-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 24).
2020-06-22SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-06-26SenateRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-06-19SenateOrdered to third reading.
2019-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 19).
2019-06-17SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-06-17SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-12SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-06-12SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-10SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-04-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-04-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1167.)
2019-04-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-04AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-04AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-04-04AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.)
2019-01-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-12-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
2018-12-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Code17504New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code14669.22New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code6253.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1267.75Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1506Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1506.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1517Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1531.15Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1562.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1567.70Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1569.682Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code246Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1001.20New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1001.21New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1001.22New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1001.23New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1001.29New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code10831New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11265Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11265.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11265.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11265.45New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11320.15New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11320.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11322.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11322.85Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11322.86Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11322.87Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11323.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11325.21New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11325.24New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11333Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11402.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11403.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11403.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11454New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11454.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11461.36Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11463Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11523Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11523.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code12301.24Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code12305.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code12305.71Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code15204.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16519.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16521.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16527Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16529Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16530Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code17021New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18900.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18901Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18901.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18901.10Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18901.25Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18927Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4418.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4646.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4684.81Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4684.82Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4685.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4691.12Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code7502.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback