CA AB795 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 309, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 309, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8726.2 of, and to add Section 8726.3 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to cemeteries.
Title
Private cemeteries: endowment funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-12 - Assembly - AB 795 Irwin Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-11 - Senate - Special Consent AB795 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AB 795 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-11 - Senate - Special Consent AB795 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AB 795 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 309, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2659.). |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2057.). |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2019-06-17 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1254.) |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 2). |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 8726.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 8726.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |