CA AB8 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 49429.5 to the Education Code, relating to pupil health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil health: mental health professionals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 8 Chu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-25SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 8. Page 1919.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (May 16).
2019-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-03-19AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-03-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 13).
2019-03-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-03-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2019-01-17AssemblyReferred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH.
2018-12-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
2018-12-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code49429.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback